Tennis canada board of directors
WebKermode has a long history with ATP, most notably serving as ATP Executive Chairman & President from 2014-2024. He has held several positions at ATP Tour events, previously … WebWomen in Table Tennis; GE News and Articles; GOVERNANCE. Bylaws; MEMBER Associations; Board of Directors; Members Council; Professional Staff; Committees; …
Tennis canada board of directors
Did you know?
Web6 Apr 2024 · The Board of Directors for WTA Ventures will consist of nine members from across the tennis, broadcasting, entertainment and finance industries. WTA CEO Steve … WebBoard of Directors Chairman Andrea Gaudenzi Player Representatives Pablo Andujar Nick Basing Mark Knowles Eno Polo Tournament Representatives Gavin Forbes Christer Hult Chris Kermode Herwig Straka ATP Player Advisory Council 1-50 Singles: Andrey Rublev 1-50 Singles: Grigor Dimitrov 51-100 Singles: Pedro Martinez
WebAshley Keber. Senior Vice President, Member Relations. Courtney McBride. Senior Vice President, Governance & Special Affairs Counsel. Giulia Orlandi. Vice President, Officiating … WebHe ran the Tennis Toronto Junior Doubles League from 2007 - 2024 building the league up to over 12 clubs and 140 participants in their one-day finals tournament. As a volunteer, …
WebBoard of Directors. Mike Tamura, Chair of the Board; Alexander Kent, Treasurer; Gérald Poirier, General Secretary; Shu-Tai Cheng, Director; Aartje Sheffield, Director WebBoard Directory ron ghitter steve kirk mike smith robert rivard wendy ng jason balakas Ron Ghitter Chairman Ron Ghitter, Q.C. was born in Calgary, Alberta and raised in Edmonton. He received his law degree at the University of Alberta and began practicing law in Calgary in 1960 where he became senior partner of the firm Ghitter & Company. Mr.
WebTennis Prince Edward Island Board of Directors President: Daniel Arseneault Vice President: Enrique Riveroll Treasurer: Matthew Weeks
Web22 Oct 2024 · Following these changes the board of directors of Tennis Alberta will comprise: President: Tom MacInnis Vice President: Sita Gourishankar Vice President … jarsoftelectricalWebTom MacInnis is an independent businessman and currently serves on the board of directors of Bellatrix Exploration Ltd. (including audit committee), Canadian Premium … jars of tearsWeb26 Apr 2016 · Tennis BC Insider, February 28, 2024 March 1, 2024 Wheelchair Instructors Course, March 11, 2024 February 23, 2024 Have You Thought About Becoming an Official? jars of white asparagusWebFormer Board of Directors Ontario Tennis Association, Vice Chair SouthWest OTA Committee TPA Certified Tennis Instructor Retired … jars of sweets for saleWeb4 Jan 2024 · Call for Board of Directors Nominations. January 4, 2024. Tennis Nova Scotia’s nomination committee is seeking individuals that have interest in joining a strong high … jars of shellsWebBoard of Directors - Athletics Canada Events All Events National Team Events Canadian Championship Series National Track & Field Tour Athletics Canada Road Race Label World Athletics Sanctioned Competitions World Para Athletics Sanctioned Competitions Hosting opportunities 2024 Canadian Mountain & Trail Running Championships jars of toffee amazonWebAs a Founder and Board of Directors member, Dr. Thompson has experience in all aspects of the MedTech industry including developing corporate and market strategies, mission and vision, monitoring ... jars of roasted red peppers